open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas
    Case Number:5:19-cv-03102
    Party Name:Strader (ID 66677) v. Werholtz et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Hearing]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address (Prisoner)]
    Date Published:July 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Conventionally]
    Date Published:July 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:July 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:July 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Prisoner Case)]
    Date Published:July 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Supplement]
    Date Published:June 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Docket Annotation]
    Date Published:June 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency - Prisoner Case]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis Prisoner Case]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ksd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?126997
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =