open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas
    Case Number:2:19-cv-02379
    Party Name:Wells v. Facebook Incorporated et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motions No Longer Referred]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Entry of Appearance]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
    Date Published:September 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Docket Annotation]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mail Returned]
    Date Published:September 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:August 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:August 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice Re Pro Se Mailing]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Show Cause]
    Date Published:August 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ksd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?127338
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =