open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas
    Case Number:6:19-cv-01179
    Party Name:Steven et al v. Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc.
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:October 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:October 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:September 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend Complaint]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Setting Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:September 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:August 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motions No Longer Referred]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:August 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:August 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:August 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:August 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Entry of Appearance]
    Date Published:August 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Judge Assignment]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint (attorney)]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ksd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?127332
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =