open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

KANSAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas
    Case Number:2:19-cv-02470
    Party Name:Herrera et al v. Decal Construction, LLC et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
    Date Published:November 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:November 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:October 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:October 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:October 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:October 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
    Date Published:September 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Judge Assignment]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint (attorney)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ksd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?127745
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =