open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Kansas

KANSAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Kansas
    Case Number:19-41015
    Party Name:Dale D Rice
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baer, Robert L [Amendments to Schedules D, E, F, G or H]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baer, Robert L [Amended Schedules]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baer, Robert L [Amended Schedule C (Only)]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baer, Robert L [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baer, Robert L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baer, Robert L [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:August 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baer, Robert L [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baer, Robert L [AAutoAsignJudge7]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baer, Robert L [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baer, Robert L [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baer, Robert L [Employee Income Records]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baer, Robert L [DeBN Request Form]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [DeBN Request Form]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baer, Robert L [Order]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Order]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baer, Robert L [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card )]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card )]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ksb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?257644
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =