open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

KANSAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas
    Case Number:6:19-cv-01322
    Party Name:Midwestern Higher Education Compact et al v. DJI Technology, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:May 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
    Date Published:February 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stay Case]
    Date Published:February 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave]
    Date Published:February 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Entry of Appearance]
    Date Published:February 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Judge Assignment]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Designation of Place of Trial]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint (attorney)]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ksd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?129464
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =