Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky
    Case Number:18-10683-jal
    Party Name:Cassie Lee Leigh
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Johnson, Alicia C. [Meeting of Creditors Held - Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:September 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Johnson, Alicia C. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:September 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Johnson, Alicia C. [In forma pauperis]
    Date Published:August 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Johnson, Alicia C. [Amended Schedules]
    Date Published:July 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Johnson, Alicia C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
    Date Published:July 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Johnson, Alicia C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Debtor]
    Date Published:July 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Johnson, Alicia C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Financial Management Requirement]
    Date Published:July 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Johnson, Alicia C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Trustee Preferred Methodology for Document Turnover]
    Date Published:July 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Johnson, Alicia C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:July 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Johnson, Alicia C. [Hearing(Document)]
    Date Published:July 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Johnson, Alicia C. [Generate 341 Notice-Chapter 7]
    Date Published:July 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Johnson, Alicia C. [Creditor Request for Notices]
    Date Published:July 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Johnson, Alicia C. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7 -Ind/Jt]
    Date Published:July 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Johnson, Alicia C. [Proposed Order]
    Date Published:July 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Proposed Order]
    Date Published:July 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Johnson, Alicia C. [Exhibit]
    Date Published:July 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Exhibit]
    Date Published:July 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Johnson, Alicia C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:July 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:July 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Johnson, Alicia C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:July 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Johnson, Alicia C. [Statement of Social Security Number]
    Date Published:July 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Johnson, Alicia C. [In forma pauperis - Case Filing Fee]
    Date Published:July 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:July 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Number]
    Date Published:July 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [In forma pauperis - Case Filing Fee]
    Date Published:July 13, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.kywb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?332618
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =