Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky
    Case Number:18-40607-thf
    Party Name:Virginia Marie Jones
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Salyer, Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:November 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Salyer, Bradley [Final Decree and Close Case]
    Date Published:November 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Salyer, Bradley [Discharging Debtor -Auto Discharge]
    Date Published:November 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Salyer, Bradley [Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:September 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Salyer, Bradley [Meeting of Creditors Held - Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:September 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Salyer, Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Debtor]
    Date Published:July 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Salyer, Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Financial Management Requirement]
    Date Published:July 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Salyer, Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Trustee Preferred Methodology for Document Turnover]
    Date Published:July 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Salyer, Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:July 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Salyer, Bradley [Generate 341 Notice-Chapter 7]
    Date Published:July 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Salyer, Bradley [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
    Date Published:July 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Salyer, Bradley [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7 -Ind/Jt]
    Date Published:July 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Salyer, Bradley [none]
    Date Published:July 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [none]
    Date Published:July 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Salyer, Bradley [Statement of Social Security Number]
    Date Published:July 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Salyer, Bradley [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:July 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Number]
    Date Published:July 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:July 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Salyer, Bradley [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:July 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:July 14, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.kywb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?332621
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =