Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Kentucky

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Kentucky
    Case Number:19-20166-tnw
    Party Name:Stacy Nicole Ezell
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Meeting of Creditors Continued (Trustee)]
    Date Published:March 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Confirmation Hearing Continued/Rescheduled (Trustee)]
    Date Published:March 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Meeting of Creditors Not Held]
    Date Published:March 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:February 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Adequate Protection Payments]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Pay Wages]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Certificate of Service Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Certification re Ch 13 Rights and Responsibilities]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Proposed Order Submitted(BK-Aty)]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Notice]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Serve Plan (Ch 12 or 13)]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [3 DAY Order to Pay Filing Fee (Electronically Filed Documents ONLY)]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Debtor (Ch 13)]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.kyeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?303332
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =