Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Kentucky
    Case Number:19-10125-jal
    Party Name:Timmy Wayne Helm and Danielle Raeanne Helm
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Burns, Jerry [Reaffirmation Agreement - With Attorney Signature]
    Date Published:April 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Burns, Jerry [Meeting of Creditors Held - Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:April 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Burns, Jerry [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:March 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Burns, Jerry [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Burns, Jerry [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Debtor]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Burns, Jerry [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Financial Management Requirement]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Burns, Jerry [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Trustee Preferred Methodology for Document Turnover]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Burns, Jerry [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Burns, Jerry [Creditor Request for Notices]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Burns, Jerry [Generate 341 Notice-Chapter 7]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Burns, Jerry [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7 -Ind/Jt]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Burns, Jerry [none]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [none]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Burns, Jerry [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Burns, Jerry [Statement of Social Security Number]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Number]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Burns, Jerry [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.kywb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?336604
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =