open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Kentucky

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Kentucky
    Case Number:19-20885-tnw
    Party Name:Carmen W Kent
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kendrick, L. Craig [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kendrick, L. Craig [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management - Ch 7 or Ch13 (BNC)]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kendrick, L. Craig [Reaffirmation Agreement]
    Date Published:August 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kendrick, L. Craig [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:August 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kendrick, L. Craig [Certificate of Service re: Payment Advices]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kendrick, L. Craig [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:July 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kendrick, L. Craig [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:July 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kendrick, L. Craig [Creditor Request for Notices]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kendrick, L. Craig [Debtor (Ch 7)]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kendrick, L. Craig [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7 No Asset Individual]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kendrick, L. Craig [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kendrick, L. Craig [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kendrick, L. Craig [Statement of Social Security Number (Form 121)]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Number (Form 121)]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kendrick, L. Craig [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.kyeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?306767
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =