open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Kentucky

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Kentucky
    Case Number:19-70438-grs
    Party Name:David Sylvester Perry
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edwards, J. Clair [Reaffirmation Agreement]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edwards, J. Clair [Miscellaneous Relief Motion]
    Date Published:September 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edwards, J. Clair [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edwards, J. Clair [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:August 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edwards, J. Clair [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edwards, J. Clair [Avoid Lien on Household Goods(O)]
    Date Published:July 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edwards, J. Clair [Proposed Order Submitted(BK-Aty)]
    Date Published:July 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edwards, J. Clair [Defective Order]
    Date Published:July 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edwards, J. Clair [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edwards, J. Clair [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edwards, J. Clair [Debtor (Ch 7)]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edwards, J. Clair [Creditor Request for Notices]
    Date Published:July 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edwards, J. Clair [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7 No Asset Individual]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edwards, J. Clair [Avoid Lien on Household Goods]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 [Avoid Lien on Household Goods]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edwards, J. Clair [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edwards, J. Clair [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Edwards, J. Clair [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.kyeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?306794
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =