open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Kentucky

KENTUCKY PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Kentucky
    Case Number:19-21474-tnw
    Party Name:Dylan L. Harper
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:June 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Objection to Claim]
    Date Published:June 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation: Recommended (Virtual)]
    Date Published:May 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Withdrawal of Document]
    Date Published:May 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:May 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Entry re Telephonic Hearing]
    Date Published:April 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation]
    Date Published:March 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Continue Hearing]
    Date Published:March 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses and Charges]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:February 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Regarding Confirmation Hearing]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management - Ch 13 (BNC)]
    Date Published:February 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:February 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Payment of Fee (Installment Payment)]
    Date Published:January 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:December 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Pay Wages]
    Date Published:December 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Proposed Order Submitted(BK-Aty)]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Disclosure of Fees by Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Statement of Current Monthly Income - Ch 13]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Schedules]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Submit Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [File (BNC)]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Creditor Request for Notices]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Notice]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Debtor (Ch 13)]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burden, Beverly M. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.kyeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?309637
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =