open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana
    Case Number:2:19-cv-00258
    Party Name:Green v. Chalmette Elementary School et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:June 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:May 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:May 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:May 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:May 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk]
    Date Published:May 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request for Summons Issued]
    Date Published:May 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:May 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:May 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Case Assignment]
    Date Published:January 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.laed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?228050
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =