Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana
    Case Number:19-10087
    Party Name:Alcenia Williams
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Dismiss/Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:March 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Memo to Record]
    Date Published:March 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Withdrawal of Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:March 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Amend Plan (Order)]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Amend Plan (Pre Confirmation) Local Rule 3015-2]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:January 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Liquidation Analysis]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Tax Documents - Private]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling Db]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Employee Income Records]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling Db]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Employee Income Records]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Schedule G]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Schedule H]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Schedule I]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Schedule J]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period Form 122C-1]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Schedule G]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Schedule H]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Schedule I]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Schedule J]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period Form 122C-1]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Schedule A/B]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Schedule C]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Schedule D]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Schedule E/F]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Schedule A/B]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Schedule C]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Schedule D]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Schedule E/F]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Social Security Statement - Private]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Social Security Statement - Private]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.laeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?191287
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =