open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana
    Case Number:2:19-cv-11108
    Party Name:Carnaval et al v. Rollins, Inc.
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:August 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement of Corporate Disclosure]
    Date Published:August 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:August 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:June 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.laed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?239588
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =