open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

LOUISIANA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana
    Case Number:5:20-cv-00202
    Party Name:Roberson v. G C A Services Group Inc
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Enroll as Counsel]
    Date Published:September 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:September 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Enroll as Counsel]
    Date Published:September 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:August 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:August 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:August 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motions Transferred]
    Date Published:August 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:August 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corrective Document]
    Date Published:August 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 26(f) Report]
    Date Published:August 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:August 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:August 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Setting Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:July 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jurisdictional Review Finding]
    Date Published:July 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:July 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:May 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:May 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)]
    Date Published:May 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:May 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued - All (Form Included)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.lawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?173059
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =