open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

LOUISIANA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana
    Case Number:6:20-cv-00198
    Party Name:Allen v. Lowes Home Center L L C
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum Ruling]
    Date Published:September 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minute Entry/Order Setting Motion]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Motion Setting]
    Date Published:June 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:June 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jurisdictional Review Finding]
    Date Published:May 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Allowing Rule 26 Report]
    Date Published:May 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 26(f) Report]
    Date Published:May 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order - Hanna/Juneau/Summerhays/Whitehurst]
    Date Published:March 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:March 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minute Entry]
    Date Published:March 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:March 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:March 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Removal Order]
    Date Published:March 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Removal Order]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [State Court Service Returned Executed (Removal Cases)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.lawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?173020
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =