U.S. Federal Court Records for the Middle District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10339
  • Case Name: Charlie Reynard Douglas
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Abide, Samera L. [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation 122A-2]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Abide, Samera L. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp) (12/14)]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Abide, Samera L. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Abide, Samera L. [Statement of Intention]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Abide, Samera L. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Abide, Samera L. [Schedules A/B-J]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Abide, Samera L. [Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Abide, Samera L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Abide, Samera L. [Vacating Order]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Abide, Samera L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Abide, Samera L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Required Filings]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Abide, Samera L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Abide, Samera L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7 No Asset]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Abide, Samera L. [Receipt (OTC auto)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Receipt (OTC auto)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Abide, Samera L. [Show Cause]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Show Cause]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Abide, Samera L. [Notice of Required Filings Chapter 7]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Notice of Required Filings Chapter 7]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Abide, Samera L. [Copy of Declaration Regarding Electronic Filing (Local Form 2)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Abide, Samera L. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Copy of Declaration Regarding Electronic Filing (Local Form 2)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Abide, Samera L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.