U.S. Federal Court Records for the Middle District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10337
  • Case Name: Franchesca Rich Brandon
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Extend Time]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Required Filings]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Objecting to Discharge]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [(auto) Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7 No Asset]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Receipt (OTC auto)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Receipt (OTC auto)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Notice of Required Filings Chapter 7]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Notice of Required Filings Chapter 7]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Copy of Declaration Regarding Electronic Filing (Local Form 2)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Copy of Declaration Regarding Electronic Filing (Local Form 2)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Schott, Martin A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.