U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-03005
  • Case Name: Louisiana Workforce Commission v. Gay
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • April 25, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Preliminary PreTrial Order]
  • April 24, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • April 23, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Preliminary Pre-Trial Conference Order - AP]
  • April 23, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • April 23, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Support Document]
  • April 23, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Autodocket US Treasury Receipt]
  • April 23, 2025: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint (Fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.