open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland

MARYLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland
    Case Number:19-20802
    Party Name:Troy McFarlane
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:November 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Extend Time]
    Date Published:November 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Extend Time for Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
    Date Published:November 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Meeting of Creditors Continued]
    Date Published:October 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:September 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Notice of Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:September 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Extend Time to Object to Discharge]
    Date Published:September 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [ADI process Return Mail]
    Date Published:September 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Requirement to Complete Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Certificate of Compliance]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [none]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (fee) - case upload]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Statement of Intent]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Social Security Number Verification Page]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mdb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?736262
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =