open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland

MARYLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland
    Case Number:19-20780
    Party Name:Catrinia Yvonne Kelly
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baer, Marc H. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:November 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baer, Marc H. [Final Decree and Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:November 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baer, Marc H. [Discharging Debtor]
    Date Published:November 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baer, Marc H. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:November 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baer, Marc H. [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:November 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baer, Marc H. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
    Date Published:November 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baer, Marc H. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:October 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baer, Marc H. [Certificate of Compliance]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baer, Marc H. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baer, Marc H. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baer, Marc H. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Requirement to Complete Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baer, Marc H. [Receipt of Filing Fee]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baer, Marc H. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baer, Marc H. [Application to Have the Filing Fee Waived]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baer, Marc H. [Statement of Intent]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baer, Marc H. [Social Security Number Verification Page]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baer, Marc H. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baer, Marc H. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baer, Marc H. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mdb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?736261
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =