open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland

MARYLAND PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Maryland
    Case Number:19-20853
    Party Name:Pamela Sue Mulligan
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Discharging Debtor]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Final Decree and Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:October 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Declaration About Individual Debtors Schedules]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Amended Schedules]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Meeting of Creditors Continued]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Deficiency Satisfied]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Certificate of Compliance]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:September 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Creditor Withdrawal of Document]
    Date Published:September 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Deficiency Notice]
    Date Published:September 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Statement Under Penalty of Perjury Re: Payment Advices]
    Date Published:September 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
    Date Published:September 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Requirement to Complete Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:August 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Statement of Intent]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [none]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Social Security Number Verification Page]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldstein, Charles R. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mdb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?736317
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =