open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Massachusetts
    Case Number:19-40812
    Party Name:Audrey A. Mund
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, Anne J. [Order Discharging Debtor]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, Anne J. [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, Anne J. [Order to Have Filing Fee Waived]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, Anne J. [Amended/Supplemental Schedules-Creditor Matrix]
    Date Published:July 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, Anne J. [Order]
    Date Published:July 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, Anne J. [Request for Notice(s) (creditor event only)]
    Date Published:May 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, Anne J. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, Anne J. [Signature Page]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, Anne J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, Anne J. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, Anne J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, Anne J. [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived (fka IFP)]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, Anne J. [Statement of Social Security Number]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, Anne J. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mab.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?492806
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =