open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Massachusetts
    Case Number:19-11670
    Party Name:Thomas A. McCarthy and Yasmin A. McCarthy
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Financial Management Course Certificate for AutoDocket Only]
    Date Published:August 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Order on Motion to Vacate]
    Date Published:June 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:June 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedule]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Schedules (Original)]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Vacate]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Order Dismissing Case(Sua Sponte)]
    Date Published:June 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Order to Update]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Statement of Social Security Number]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mab.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?492805
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =