open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:2:98-cr-80996-1
    Party Name:USA v. Lake
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment on Violation of Supervised Release/Probation]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Assistant U.S. Attorney]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Pending Trial]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment ]
    Date Published:October 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:September 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Error]
    Date Published:August 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion - Free]
    Date Published:June 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Transcript]
    Date Published:June 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Quash ]
    Date Published:June 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Compel ]
    Date Published:June 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue - Ends of Justice]
    Date Published:May 22, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mied.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?289483
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =