Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan

  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:4:17-cv-13334
    Party Name:County of Wayne et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Substitution/Withdrawal of Attorney]
    Date Published:November 16, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:4:17-cv-13334
    Party Name:County of Wayne et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled]
    Date Published:November 15, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:4:17-cv-13334
    Party Name:County of Wayne et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:November 15, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:4:17-cv-13334
    Party Name:County of Wayne et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Stay]
    Date Published:November 15, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:4:17-cv-13334
    Party Name:County of Wayne et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:November 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:4:17-cv-13334
    Party Name:County of Wayne et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Withdrawal of Attorney]
    Date Published:November 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:4:17-cv-13334
    Party Name:County of Wayne et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Appear*]
    Date Published:November 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:4:17-cv-13334
    Party Name:County of Wayne et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Stay]
    Date Published:November 09, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:4:17-cv-13334
    Party Name:County of Wayne et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:November 09, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:2:17-cv-13334
    Party Name:County of Wayne et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Reassignment/Disqualification]
    Date Published:October 24, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:5:17-cv-13334
    Party Name:County of Wayne et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option]
    Date Published:October 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:2:17-cv-13334
    Party Name:County of Wayne et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Appearance]
    Date Published:October 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:2:17-cv-13334
    Party Name:County of Wayne et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Civil Case - Complaint]
    Date Published:October 12, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.mied.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?324100

Post Your Comment or Question

8 x 3 =