Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan

  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:2:17-cv-13707
    Party Name:Woodall et al v. County of Wayne et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Supplemental Brief]
    Date Published:July 12, 2018
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:2:17-cv-13707
    Party Name:Woodall et al v. County of Wayne et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Text-Only Order]
    Date Published:July 12, 2018
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:2:17-cv-13707
    Party Name:Woodall et al v. County of Wayne et al
    Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:July 12, 2018
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:2:17-cv-13707
    Party Name:Woodall et al v. County of Wayne et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Certify Class]
    Date Published:June 28, 2018
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:2:17-cv-13707
    Party Name:Woodall et al v. County of Wayne et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File]
    Date Published:June 13, 2018
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:2:17-cv-13707
    Party Name:Woodall et al v. County of Wayne et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Hearing on Motion*]
    Date Published:June 07, 2018
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:2:17-cv-13707
    Party Name:Woodall et al v. County of Wayne et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:May 29, 2018
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:2:17-cv-13707
    Party Name:Woodall et al v. County of Wayne et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:May 15, 2018
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:2:17-cv-13707
    Party Name:Woodall et al v. County of Wayne et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:May 03, 2018
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:2:17-cv-13707
    Party Name:Woodall et al v. County of Wayne et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Appear*]
    Date Published:April 20, 2018
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:2:17-cv-13707
    Party Name:Woodall et al v. County of Wayne et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:April 19, 2018
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:2:17-cv-13707
    Party Name:Woodall et al v. County of Wayne et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation and Order]
    Date Published:March 21, 2018
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:2:17-cv-13707
    Party Name:Woodall et al v. County of Wayne et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Requiring Responsive Pleading*]
    Date Published:March 21, 2018
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:2:17-cv-13707
    Party Name:Woodall et al v. County of Wayne et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option]
    Date Published:November 15, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:2:17-cv-13707
    Party Name:Woodall et al v. County of Wayne et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Civil Case - Complaint]
    Date Published:November 14, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.mied.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?325006

Post Your Comment or Question

8 x 1 =