Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan

  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:17-04755-tjt
    Party Name:Proctor v. Wayne County Treasurer et al
    Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Minute Entry. Case Closed]
    Date Published:May 22, 2018
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:17-04755-tjt
    Party Name:Proctor v. Wayne County Treasurer et al
    Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Minute Entry. Matter Settled]
    Date Published:May 07, 2018
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:17-04755-tjt
    Party Name:Proctor v. Wayne County Treasurer et al
    Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Minute Entry. Motion Granted]
    Date Published:February 21, 2018
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:17-04755-tjt
    Party Name:Proctor v. Wayne County Treasurer et al
    Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Reply]
    Date Published:February 12, 2018
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:17-04755-tjt
    Party Name:Proctor v. Wayne County Treasurer et al
    Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [.]
    Date Published:January 29, 2018
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:17-04755-tjt
    Party Name:Proctor v. Wayne County Treasurer et al
    Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Set Hearing]
    Date Published:January 29, 2018
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:17-04755-tjt
    Party Name:Proctor v. Wayne County Treasurer et al
    Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:January 29, 2018
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:17-04755-tjt
    Party Name:Proctor v. Wayne County Treasurer et al
    Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Report of Parties Rule 26(f) Conference]
    Date Published:January 24, 2018
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:17-04755-tjt
    Party Name:Proctor v. Wayne County Treasurer et al
    Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:January 04, 2018
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:17-04755-tjt
    Party Name:Proctor v. Wayne County Treasurer et al
    Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Brief]
    Date Published:January 02, 2018
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:17-04755-tjt
    Party Name:Proctor v. Wayne County Treasurer et al
    Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice of Initial Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:January 02, 2018
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:17-04755-tjt
    Party Name:Proctor v. Wayne County Treasurer et al
    Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Objection]
    Date Published:December 30, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:17-04755-tjt
    Party Name:Proctor v. Wayne County Treasurer et al
    Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:December 18, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:17-04755-tjt
    Party Name:Proctor v. Wayne County Treasurer et al
    Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Dismiss Defendant (s)]
    Date Published:December 18, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:17-04755-tjt
    Party Name:Proctor v. Wayne County Treasurer et al
    Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
    Date Published:December 15, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:17-04755-tjt
    Party Name:Proctor v. Wayne County Treasurer et al
    Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
    Date Published:November 17, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:17-04755-tjt
    Party Name:Proctor v. Wayne County Treasurer et al
    Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Request for Reissued Summons]
    Date Published:November 17, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:17-04755-tjt
    Party Name:Proctor v. Wayne County Treasurer et al
    Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Reissued Summons (auto)]
    Date Published:November 17, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:17-04755-tjt
    Party Name:Proctor v. Wayne County Treasurer et al
    Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Improper Service of Summons/Complaint on Defendant]
    Date Published:November 15, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.mieb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?876665

Post Your Comment or Question

4 x 3 =