Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan

  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:2:17-cv-13762
    Party Name:Ulveling et al v. Wayne County of et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Strike]
    Date Published:February 05, 2018
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:2:17-cv-13762
    Party Name:Ulveling et al v. Wayne County of et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Hearing on Motion*]
    Date Published:January 23, 2018
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:2:17-cv-13762
    Party Name:Ulveling et al v. Wayne County of et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Motion - Free]
    Date Published:January 16, 2018
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:2:17-cv-13762
    Party Name:Ulveling et al v. Wayne County of et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:January 12, 2018
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:2:17-cv-13762
    Party Name:Ulveling et al v. Wayne County of et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Extend Time to - Free]
    Date Published:January 09, 2018
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:2:17-cv-13762
    Party Name:Ulveling et al v. Wayne County of et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:December 21, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:2:17-cv-13762
    Party Name:Ulveling et al v. Wayne County of et al
    Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:December 21, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:2:17-cv-13762
    Party Name:Ulveling et al v. Wayne County of et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Appearance]
    Date Published:December 04, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:2:17-cv-13762
    Party Name:Ulveling et al v. Wayne County of et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Correction]
    Date Published:November 29, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:2:17-cv-13762
    Party Name:Ulveling et al v. Wayne County of et al
    Filing Type:Civil [MDL Conditional Transfer Order - Transfer In]
    Date Published:November 29, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:2:17-cv-13762
    Party Name:Ulveling et al v. Wayne County of et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Civil Case - Complaint]
    Date Published:November 20, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.mied.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?325167

Post Your Comment or Question

2 x 2 =