open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:19-40436-mar
    Party Name:Sherita Yolanda Selley
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lim, K. Jin [Final Decree and Case Closed]
    Date Published:April 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lim, K. Jin [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:April 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lim, K. Jin [Discharging Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:April 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lim, K. Jin [Chapter 7 Final Installment Payment/Filing Fee Paid in Full]
    Date Published:March 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lim, K. Jin [none]
    Date Published:March 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lim, K. Jin [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lim, K. Jin [Certification of Completion of Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lim, K. Jin [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lim, K. Jin [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lim, K. Jin [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (order)]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lim, K. Jin [Flags Set CASECHECKED]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lim, K. Jin [Creditor Request for Notice]
    Date Published:January 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lim, K. Jin [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lim, K. Jin [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lim, K. Jin [Certificate of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lim, K. Jin [Bankruptcy Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lim, K. Jin [Statement of Intention for Individuals Filing Under Chapter 7]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lim, K. Jin [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lim, K. Jin [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lim, K. Jin [Statement About Your Social Security Numbers]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mieb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?904260
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =