Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:19-40435-mar
    Party Name:Dawn Marie Nobiling
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lewis, Wendy Turner [none]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lewis, Wendy Turner [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:February 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lewis, Wendy Turner [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:February 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lewis, Wendy Turner [Certification of Completion of Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lewis, Wendy Turner [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lewis, Wendy Turner [Receipt of Installment Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lewis, Wendy Turner [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lewis, Wendy Turner [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lewis, Wendy Turner [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (order)]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lewis, Wendy Turner [Flags Set CASECHECKED]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lewis, Wendy Turner [Creditor Request for Notice]
    Date Published:January 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lewis, Wendy Turner [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lewis, Wendy Turner [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lewis, Wendy Turner [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lewis, Wendy Turner [Statement About Your Social Security Numbers]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lewis, Wendy Turner [Certificate of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lewis, Wendy Turner [Bankruptcy Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lewis, Wendy Turner [Statement of Intention for Individuals Filing Under Chapter 7]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lewis, Wendy Turner [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mieb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?904259
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =