open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:2:19-cv-10763
    Party Name:Wright et al v. Ocwen Loan Servicing et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:August 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Stay]
    Date Published:July 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:May 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Directing Service by the US Marshal]
    Date Published:April 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs]
    Date Published:April 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stay]
    Date Published:March 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Regarding Parties Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes*]
    Date Published:March 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Case - Complaint]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mied.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?336954
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =