open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:19-31660-jda
    Party Name:Michael Copeland
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Corcoran, Collene K. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Corcoran, Collene K. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Corcoran, Collene K. [Reaffirmation Agreement w/ Declaration and Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:August 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Corcoran, Collene K. [Certification of Completion of Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:July 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Corcoran, Collene K. [Flags Set CASECHECKED]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Corcoran, Collene K. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:July 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [none]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Statement About Your Social Security Numbers]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Bankruptcy Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Intention for Individuals Filing Under Chapter 7]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mieb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?917283
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =