open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:19-50126-mbm
    Party Name:Timothy Wayne Brock
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ruskin, David Wm [Minute Entry]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ruskin, David Wm [Adjourn/Reschedule/Continue Hearing]
    Date Published:October 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ruskin, David Wm [Stipulation]
    Date Published:October 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ruskin, David Wm [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ruskin, David Wm [Stipulation Excusing Entry of Third Party Payment Order]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ruskin, David Wm [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:August 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ruskin, David Wm [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
    Date Published:August 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ruskin, David Wm [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:July 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ruskin, David Wm [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ruskin, David Wm [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ruskin, David Wm [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ruskin, David Wm [Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ruskin, David Wm [Schedules A-J]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ruskin, David Wm [Declaration About an Individual Debtor(s) Schedules]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ruskin, David Wm [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ruskin, David Wm [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ruskin, David Wm [Chapter 13 Case Management Order]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ruskin, David Wm [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:July 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ruskin, David Wm [none]
    Date Published:July 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ruskin, David Wm [Creditor Request for Notice]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Ruskin, David Wm [Flags Set CASECHECKED]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mieb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?917223
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =