open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:19-50163-mar
    Party Name:Roni S Moyer-Eley
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ellmann, Douglas [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:August 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ellmann, Douglas [Stipulation for Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ellmann, Douglas [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ellmann, Douglas [341 Meeting Issued after Auto Assign]
    Date Published:July 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ellmann, Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ellmann, Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:July 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ellmann, Douglas [none]
    Date Published:July 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Bankruptcy Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Statement About Your Social Security Numbers]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mieb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?917281
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =