open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:19-50162-mbm
    Party Name:Kimberly A Glaspie
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ellmann, Douglas [Reaffirmation Agreement w/ Declaration and Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:September 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ellmann, Douglas [Certification of Completion of Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:August 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ellmann, Douglas [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:August 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ellmann, Douglas [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:July 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ellmann, Douglas [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
    Date Published:July 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ellmann, Douglas [Statement of Intention for Individuals Filing Under Chapter 7]
    Date Published:July 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ellmann, Douglas [Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:July 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ellmann, Douglas [Statement of Attorney for Debtor(s) Pursuant to F.R.Bankr.P.2016(b)]
    Date Published:July 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ellmann, Douglas [Schedules A-J]
    Date Published:July 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ellmann, Douglas [Declaration About an Individual Debtor(s) Schedules]
    Date Published:July 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ellmann, Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ellmann, Douglas [Flags Set CASECHECKED]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ellmann, Douglas [Deficiency Notice (BK)]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ellmann, Douglas [Order]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ellmann, Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:July 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ellmann, Douglas [Creditor Request for Notice]
    Date Published:July 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ellmann, Douglas [none]
    Date Published:July 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Bankruptcy Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Statement About Your Social Security Numbers]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mieb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?917280
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =