open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan

MICHIGAN PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:2:19-cv-12380
    Party Name:Bush v. Eang et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Service of Notice of Appeal - 6th Circuit*]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appeal - 6th Circuit]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Case - Complaint, Amended]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Show Cause]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Regarding Parties Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes*]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Case - Complaint]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mied.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?340832
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =