open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan

MICHIGAN PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:2:19-cv-12381
    Party Name:Carter v. University of Texas at Dallas et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Adopting Report and Recommendation]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Evidentiary Hearing]
    Date Published:November 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:November 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:November 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:October 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Disqualify Counsel]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report and Recommendation]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Requiring Responsive Pleading*]
    Date Published:October 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disqualify Counsel]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Case - Complaint, Amended]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Preliminary Injunction]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Supplemental Brief]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge*]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Case - Complaint]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mied.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?340831
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =