open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan

MICHIGAN PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:2:19-cv-12386
    Party Name:Garry v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:October 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdrawal of Attorney]
    Date Published:October 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument*]
    Date Published:October 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice - Other]
    Date Published:October 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:October 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation and Order]
    Date Published:October 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:October 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appearance]
    Date Published:September 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Case - Complaint]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mied.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?340828
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =