open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan

MICHIGAN PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:4:19-cv-13286
    Party Name:Jerome v. Chapman
  • Filing Type:Civil [Filing Rule 5 Materials]
    Date Published:May 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Habeas Petition]
    Date Published:May 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text-Only Reassignment Pursuant to Administrative Order]
    Date Published:January 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appearance]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Change of Address/Contact Information]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Regarding Parties Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes*]
    Date Published:November 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Requiring Responsive Pleading*]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Case - Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mied.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?343013
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =