Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota

  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-40064
    Party Name:ELIJAH GBOEAH
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Notice of post petition mortgage fees, expenses, and charges]
    Date Published:July 18, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-40064
    Party Name:ELIJAH GBOEAH
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Order granting compensation - Ch 13 (Post and Pre)]
    Date Published:May 08, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-40064
    Party Name:ELIJAH GBOEAH
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:May 06, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-40064
    Party Name:ELIJAH GBOEAH
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Application for compensation preconfirmation Ch 13]
    Date Published:May 04, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-40064
    Party Name:ELIJAH GBOEAH
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Order confirming chapter 13 plan (no fees)]
    Date Published:May 04, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-40064
    Party Name:ELIJAH GBOEAH
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Minutes re: Ch 13]
    Date Published:April 06, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-40064
    Party Name:ELIJAH GBOEAH
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Hearing continued other]
    Date Published:March 30, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-40064
    Party Name:ELIJAH GBOEAH
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Certificate of completion of financial management course]
    Date Published:March 06, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-40064
    Party Name:ELIJAH GBOEAH
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Modified chapter 13 plan (Preconfirmation)]
    Date Published:February 21, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-40064
    Party Name:ELIJAH GBOEAH
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Meeting held - Ch 13 Trustee menu]
    Date Published:February 09, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-40064
    Party Name:ELIJAH GBOEAH
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Notice of appearance and request for notice]
    Date Published:January 19, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-40064
    Party Name:ELIJAH GBOEAH
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [BNC Certificate of mailing - Meeting of creditors]
    Date Published:January 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-40064
    Party Name:ELIJAH GBOEAH
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Ch 13 Plan]
    Date Published:January 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-40064
    Party Name:ELIJAH GBOEAH
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-40064
    Party Name:ELIJAH GBOEAH
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-40064
    Party Name:ELIJAH GBOEAH
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-40064
    Party Name:ELIJAH GBOEAH
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Statement of business income (Local form 1007-3, Financial Review of the Debtor's Business)]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-40064
    Party Name:ELIJAH GBOEAH
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [MNB Statement of business income (Local form 1007-3, Financial Review of the Debtor's Business)]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-40064
    Party Name:ELIJAH GBOEAH
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [none]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-40064
    Party Name:ELIJAH GBOEAH
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [none]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-40064
    Party Name:ELIJAH GBOEAH
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Chapter 13 plan]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-40064
    Party Name:ELIJAH GBOEAH
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Certificate of credit counseling]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-40064
    Party Name:ELIJAH GBOEAH
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Signature declaration]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-40064
    Party Name:ELIJAH GBOEAH
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Income records of Debtor (payment advices)]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-40064
    Party Name:ELIJAH GBOEAH
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Notice of responsibilities of chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-40064
    Party Name:ELIJAH GBOEAH
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [MNB Chapter 13 plan]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-40064
    Party Name:ELIJAH GBOEAH
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [MNB Certificate of credit counseling]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-40064
    Party Name:ELIJAH GBOEAH
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [MNB Signature declaration]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-40064
    Party Name:ELIJAH GBOEAH
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [MNB Income records of Debtor (payment advices)]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-40064
    Party Name:ELIJAH GBOEAH
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [MNB Notice of responsibilities of chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-40064
    Party Name:ELIJAH GBOEAH
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Voluntary chapter 13 petition (fee)]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-40064
    Party Name:ELIJAH GBOEAH
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [MNB Voluntary chapter 13 petition (fee)]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.mnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?434539

Post Your Comment or Question

2 x 3 =