Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota

  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-30057
    Party Name:Timothy D Flores and Theresa M Flores
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Order confirming chapter 13 plan (no fees)]
    Date Published:October 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-30057
    Party Name:Timothy D Flores and Theresa M Flores
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Notice of mortgage payment change]
    Date Published:August 02, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-30057
    Party Name:Timothy D Flores and Theresa M Flores
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Notice to debtor(s) re: financial management certification]
    Date Published:March 27, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-30057
    Party Name:Timothy D Flores and Theresa M Flores
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Minutes re: Ch 13]
    Date Published:March 09, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-30057
    Party Name:Timothy D Flores and Theresa M Flores
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Withdrawal of motion (text only)]
    Date Published:March 08, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-30057
    Party Name:Timothy D Flores and Theresa M Flores
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Meeting held - Ch 13 Trustee menu]
    Date Published:February 27, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-30057
    Party Name:Timothy D Flores and Theresa M Flores
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Motion to dismiss chapter 13 case]
    Date Published:February 09, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-30057
    Party Name:Timothy D Flores and Theresa M Flores
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Notice by chapter 13 trustee of non-concluded meeting]
    Date Published:February 09, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-30057
    Party Name:Timothy D Flores and Theresa M Flores
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Notice of rescheduled meeting of creditors]
    Date Published:February 08, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-30057
    Party Name:Timothy D Flores and Theresa M Flores
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Statement of business income (Local form 1007-3, Financial Review of the Debtor's Business)]
    Date Published:February 02, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-30057
    Party Name:Timothy D Flores and Theresa M Flores
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Income records of Debtor (payment advices)]
    Date Published:January 24, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-30057
    Party Name:Timothy D Flores and Theresa M Flores
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Notice of appearance and request for notice]
    Date Published:January 24, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-30057
    Party Name:Timothy D Flores and Theresa M Flores
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:January 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-30057
    Party Name:Timothy D Flores and Theresa M Flores
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [BNC Certificate of mailing - Meeting of creditors]
    Date Published:January 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-30057
    Party Name:Timothy D Flores and Theresa M Flores
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Ch 13 Plan]
    Date Published:January 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-30057
    Party Name:Timothy D Flores and Theresa M Flores
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Order on partial case filing]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-30057
    Party Name:Timothy D Flores and Theresa M Flores
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-30057
    Party Name:Timothy D Flores and Theresa M Flores
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [none]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-30057
    Party Name:Timothy D Flores and Theresa M Flores
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [none]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-30057
    Party Name:Timothy D Flores and Theresa M Flores
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Chapter 13 plan]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-30057
    Party Name:Timothy D Flores and Theresa M Flores
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-30057
    Party Name:Timothy D Flores and Theresa M Flores
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Certificate of credit counseling]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-30057
    Party Name:Timothy D Flores and Theresa M Flores
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Signature declaration]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-30057
    Party Name:Timothy D Flores and Theresa M Flores
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Notice of responsibilities of chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-30057
    Party Name:Timothy D Flores and Theresa M Flores
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [MNB Chapter 13 plan]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-30057
    Party Name:Timothy D Flores and Theresa M Flores
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-30057
    Party Name:Timothy D Flores and Theresa M Flores
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [MNB Certificate of credit counseling]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-30057
    Party Name:Timothy D Flores and Theresa M Flores
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [MNB Signature declaration]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-30057
    Party Name:Timothy D Flores and Theresa M Flores
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [MNB Notice of responsibilities of chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-30057
    Party Name:Timothy D Flores and Theresa M Flores
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Burrell, Gregory A [MNB Voluntary chapter 13 petition (fee)]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-30057
    Party Name:Timothy D Flores and Theresa M Flores
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [MNB Voluntary chapter 13 petition (fee)]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.mnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?434538

Post Your Comment or Question

6 x 3 =