Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:19-30763
    Party Name:David Curtis
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hedback, John A. [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:April 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hedback, John A. [MNB Certificate of completion of financial management course]
    Date Published:March 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hedback, John A. [BNC Certificate of mailing - Meeting of creditors]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hedback, John A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hedback, John A. [MNB Notice of responsibilities of chapter 7 debtors and their attorneys]
    Date Published:March 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hedback, John A. [MNB Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hedback, John A. [MNB Order on partial case filing]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [none]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Income records of Debtor (payment advices)]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Disclosure of compensation of attorney for debtor]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Signature declaration]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Certificate of credit counseling]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Notice of responsibilities of chapter 7 debtors and their attorneys]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Voluntary chapter 7 petition (fee)]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?456560
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =