Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:19-50201
    Party Name:RENEE N BENTLEY-KONO and DAYRE ALLAN KONO
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stermer, J. Richard [MNB Ch 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stermer, J. Richard [MNB Request for notice by creditor]
    Date Published:April 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stermer, J. Richard [MNB Notice of appearance and request for notice]
    Date Published:March 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stermer, J. Richard [MNB Notice of debtor's prior filings]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stermer, J. Richard [BNC Certificate of mailing - Meeting of creditors]
    Date Published:March 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stermer, J. Richard [MNB Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stermer, J. Richard [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stermer, J. Richard [MNB Notice of responsibilities of chapter 7 debtors and their attorneys]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stermer, J. Richard [none]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stermer, J. Richard [MNB Voluntary chapter 7 petition (fee)]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stermer, J. Richard [MNB Certificate of credit counseling]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stermer, J. Richard [MNB Signature declaration]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stermer, J. Richard [MNB Income records of Debtor (payment advices)]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?456556
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =