open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:19-31212
    Party Name:Daniel Joseph Hoheisel
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [MNB AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:August 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [MNB Discharge of debtor (Auto)]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [MNB Notice to debtor(s) re: financial management certification]
    Date Published:July 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [MNB Certificate of completion of financial management course]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [MNB Ch 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:May 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [MNB Income records of Debtor (payment advices)]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [BNC Certificate of mailing - Meeting of creditors]
    Date Published:April 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:April 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [MNB Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [MNB Order on partial case filing]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [MNB Notice of responsibilities of chapter 7 debtors and their attorneys]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Notice of responsibilities of chapter 7 debtors and their attorneys]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [MNB Signature declaration]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Signature declaration]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [MNB Certificate of credit counseling]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Certificate of credit counseling]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [none]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [none]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jensen-Carter, Mary Jo A [MNB Voluntary chapter 7 petition (fee)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Voluntary chapter 7 petition (fee)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?457674
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =