open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:19-60226
    Party Name:Barbara Jean Achilles
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle [MNB Objection to confirmation of ch 13 plan]
    Date Published:July 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle [BNC Certificate of mailing - Meeting of creditors]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Ch 13 Plan]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle [MNB Notice of appearance and request for notice]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle [MNB Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle [MNB Convert case]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle [MNB Chapter 13 plan]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle [MNB Signature declaration]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle [MNB Conversion of chapter 7 to chapter 13 by debtor]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [MNB U. S. Trustee statement of declination]
    Date Published:July 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [MNB U. S. Trustee statement of presumed abuse]
    Date Published:June 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [MNB Meeting of creditors concluded - chapter 7 case]
    Date Published:June 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [MNB Ch 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:June 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [MNB Certificate of completion of financial management course]
    Date Published:June 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [MNB Certificate of service]
    Date Published:May 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [MNB Notice of debtor's prior filings]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [BNC Certificate of mailing - Meeting of creditors]
    Date Published:April 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [MNB Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [MNB Order granting application for admission pro hac vice - aplcn]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [MNB Signature declaration]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [MNB Notice of responsibilities of chapter 7 debtors and their attorneys]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [MNB Disclosure of compensation of attorney for debtor]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [MNB Income records of Debtor (payment advices)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [none]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [MNB Certificate of credit counseling]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [none]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [MNB Certificate of credit counseling]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [MNB Application for admission pro hac vice - (FILE TO BKY CASE ONLY) (fee)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [MNB Application for admission pro hac vice - (FILE TO BKY CASE ONLY) (fee)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [MNB Voluntary chapter 7 petition (fee)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [MNB Voluntary chapter 7 petition (fee)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?457682
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =