Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:19-31218
    Party Name:JENNY MICHELE SIMPSON
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dietz, Michael S. [MNB Ch 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dietz, Michael S. [MNB Meeting of creditors concluded - chapter 7 case]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dietz, Michael S. [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:April 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dietz, Michael S. [MNB Request for notice by creditor]
    Date Published:April 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dietz, Michael S. [BNC Certificate of mailing - Meeting of creditors]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dietz, Michael S. [MNB Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dietz, Michael S. [MNB Notice of important information for pro se debtors]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dietz, Michael S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:April 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:April 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Receipt of filing fee (OTC auto)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Pay filing fee in installments - aplcn]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Income records of Debtor (payment advices)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Certificate of credit counseling]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Application for individuals to pay the filing fee in installments]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Voluntary chapter 7 petition (fee)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?457681
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =