open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:19-31217
    Party Name:Thomas Shawback and Chelsea Shawback
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dietz, Michael S. [MNB AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:August 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dietz, Michael S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:July 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dietz, Michael S. [MNB Discharge of debtor (Auto)]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dietz, Michael S. [MNB Certificate of completion of financial management course]
    Date Published:June 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dietz, Michael S. [MNB Ch 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dietz, Michael S. [BNC Certificate of mailing - Meeting of creditors]
    Date Published:April 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dietz, Michael S. [MNB Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:April 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Notice of responsibilities of chapter 7 debtors and their attorneys]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Signature declaration]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Income records of Debtor (payment advices)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Certificate of credit counseling]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [none]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Voluntary chapter 7 petition (fee)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?457680
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =